Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998073

EP0998073 - Method and system for inter-equipment authentication and key delivery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/18]Scheme, system and equipment for inter-equipment authentication and key delivery
[2006/05]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2006/24]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawasaki, Akihisa
5-10-20-208, Sagamiono
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa, 228-0803 / JP
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date99121466.928.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateJP1998032444830.10.1998         Original published format: JP 32444898
JP1998037099225.12.1998         Original published format: JP 37099298
[2004/02]
Former [2000/18]JP1998032444830.10.1998
JP1998037099224.12.1998
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0998073
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0998073
Date:03.03.2004
[2004/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998073
Date:14.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/32, G07B15/00
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/48]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Authentifikation und zum Schlüsselaustausch zwischen verschiedenen Komponenten[2000/18]
English:Method and system for inter-equipment authentication and key delivery[2006/05]
French:Procédé et système d'authentification et d'échange de clé entre plusieurs composants[2000/18]
Former [2000/18]Scheme, system and equipment for inter-equipment authentication and key delivery
Examination procedure21.04.2004Examination requested  [2004/25]
29.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2006Fee for grant paid
18.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5534857  (LAING SIMON G [AU], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 37 * * figure 3 *;
 [X]EP0809379  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-16 * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 16 * * column 10, line 25 - column 11, line 5 * * column 14, line 46 - column 16, line 13 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [XA]DE19523466  (INFORMATIKZENTRUM DER SPARKASS [DE]) [X] 1,12,14 * column 3, line 9 - line 34; figure 4 * [A] 2-11,13,15,16;
 [XA]EP0427465  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,12,14,17 * column 5, line 4 - line 50; figure 1 * [A] 2-11,13,15,16,18-28;
 [XP]EP0939514  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,12,14 * figure 3; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0772161  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 17-28 * abstract *;
 [A]  TETSUSAKI K, "High security electronic toll and traffic management and road pricing system using encrypted messages and personal identity number", VEHICLE NAVIGATION AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, 1994. PROCEEDINGS., 1994 YOKOHAMA, JAPAN 31 AUG.-2 SEPT. 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940831), ISBN 0-7803-2105-7, pages 695 - 698, XP010136555 [A] 17-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VNIS.1994.396764