Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001515

EP1001515 - Switched-mode power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  20.06.2008
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/17]For all designated states
THOMSON Licensing
46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2008/16]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing, S.A.
46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2008/10]For all designated states
THOMSON
46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH
Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bicheler, Hans-Günter
Königsbergerstrasse 1
78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
02 / Rilly, Gerard
Panoramaweg 6
78089 Unterkirnach / DE
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Arnold, Klaus-Peter
Deutsche Thomson OHG
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D
30625 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Arnold, Klaus-Peter
Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Former [2005/26]Arnold, Klaus-Peter, Dr.
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Former [2000/20]Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr.
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date99121522.929.10.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateDE199815178910.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19851789
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1001515
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1001515
Date:04.10.2000
[2000/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/335, H04N3/18, H04N3/185
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/25]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leistungsschaltnetzteil[2000/20]
English:Switched-mode power supply[2000/20]
French:Alimentation de puissance à découpage[2000/20]
Examination procedure21.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
17.06.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
21.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
24.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4745538  (CROSS BRYAN N [GB], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 65 * [Y] 6-8;
 [AY]US4968106  (IKEUCHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 12 * * column 6, line 39 - column 8, line 33 * [Y] 6-8;
 [AD]DE4101504  (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3912849  (CEAG LICHT & STROM [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *