Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033451

EP1033451 - Method for erecting a building unit, building unit and process for connecting walls [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.09.2001
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.10.2001 [2001/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baumanagement Johannes Tribelhorn
Postplatz / Schanz 4
6301 Zugstal / CH
[2000/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Tribelhorn, Johannes
Altmarktstrasse 89A
4410 Liestal / CH
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Hotz, Klaus
c/o OK pat AG, Patente Marken Lizenzen, Chamerstrasse 50
6300 Zug / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Hotz, Klaus, Dipl.-El.-Ing./ETH
c/o OK pat AG, Patente Marken Lizenzen, Hinterbergstrasse 36, Postfach 5254
6330 Cham / CH
Application number, filing date99121647.402.11.1999
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateCH1999000036501.03.1999         Original published format: CH 36599
[2000/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033451
Date:06.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033451
Date:13.09.2000
[2000/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:E04B1/35, E04B1/04
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Errichtung einer Gebäudeeinheit, Gebäudeeinheit und Verfahren zur Verbindung von zwei Wandungen[2000/36]
English:Method for erecting a building unit, building unit and process for connecting walls[2000/36]
French:Procédé pour l'érection d'une unité de construction, unité de construction et procédé pour la connection de parois[2000/36]
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
23.03.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
24.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
14.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/43]
22.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/43]
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2753468  (RAISON STEPHANE [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,8-11,13-15,18 * column W *;
 [X]US4903441  (NIERLE PIERRE [CH]) [X] 1,3,4,8-11,13-16,18 * column W *;
 [Y]EP0282425  (PHENOL ENG [FR]) [Y] 1,3,4,8-12,14,16,18,19 * column W *;
 [Y]US4469086  (IVORRA CLAUDE [FR]) [Y] 1,3,4,8-12,14,16,18,19 * column W *;
 [XA]US3831327  (MC CRILLIS R, et al) [X] 11,12,14-16,18 * column W * [A] 1,3,4,8,10;
 [XA]US4110952  (BLACHURA LEON) [X] 11,12,14 * column W * [A] 1,3,10;
 [XA]US5402618  (BIFFIS LOU G [CA], et al) [X] 11,12,14 * column W * [A] 1,3,10;
 [A]FR2132610  (FELCIAI LAURENT) [A] 1,11,12 * column W *;
 [A]DE19644261  (D D C PLANUNGS ENTWICKLUNGS UN [DE]) [A] 1,4-9,11,16-20 * column W *;
 [A]FR2174323  (HERBERT RENE [FR]) [A] 1,11 * column W *;
 [E]DE19836495  (LIEDKE CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [E] 1,3,4,10-12,14,16,18,19 * column W *;
 [X]DE1910887  (GNASS REINHOLD) [X] 21,22 * column W *;
 [X]DE2441262  (LUTZ WALTER) [X] 21,22 * column W *;
 [X]FR2240324  (THEVENOT CHRISTIAN [FR]) [X] 23 * column W *;
 [X]WO9213704  (LOENNOE ANDERS [SE], et al) [X] 23 * column W *;
 [E]WO9914450  (SGP INC [US]) [E] 23 * page 6, line 8 - page 8, line 16 *