Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0999325

EP0999325 - Vehicle door handle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.01.2018  [2018/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
U-Shin Italia S.p.A.
Via Torino 31
10044 Pianezza / IT
[2017/38]
Former [2014/22]For all designated states
U-Shin Italia S.p.A.
Via Torino 31
10044 Pianezza / IT
Former [2014/08]For all designated states
U-SHIN ITALIA S.P.A.
Via Torino 31 - Cap
10044 Pianezza (TO) / IT
Former [2008/43]For all designated states
Valeo S.p.A.
Via Asti 89
Santena (TO) / IT
Former [2007/21]For all designated states
Valeo Sicurezza Abitacolo S.p.A.
Via Asti, 89
10026 Santena / IT
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
Valeo Sicurezza Abitacolo S.p.A.
Via Asti, 89
10026 Santena / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Agostini, Astorre
Via Della Costa, 51
10091 Alpignano / IT
02 / Savant, Fiorenzo
Via Vacchieri, 3
10093 Collegno / IT
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Prinz & Partner mbB , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 31 04 20
80104 München / DE
[2017/38]
Former [2014/31]Larger, Solène , et al
U-Shin France SAS
Service Propriété Industrielle
2-10, rue Claude Nicolas Ledoux
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2013/47]Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob , et al
Innovincia
11, avenue des Tilleuls
74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR
Former [2011/08]Jacquot, Ludovic R. G. , et al
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Propriété Industrielle 76 rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc
94046 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2009/36]Jacquot, Ludovic R. G.
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Propriété Industrielle 42 Rue Le Corbusier Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2009/16]Jacquot, Ludovic R. G.
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2004/40]Rosolen-Delarue, Katell
Valeo Securité Habitacle, Service Propriété Industrielle, 42, rue Le Corbusier - Europarc
94042 Creteil Cedex / FR
Former [2004/05]Hervouet, Sylvie , et al
Valeo Sécurité Habitacle 42, rue Le Corbusier
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2002/26]Croonenbroek, Thomas , et al
Valeo Securité Habitacle, 42, rue Le Corbusier, Europarc
94042 Créteil Cedex / FR
Former [2000/19]Franzolin, Luigi , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date99121669.802.11.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateIT1998TO0092503.11.1998         Original published format: IT TO980925
[2000/19]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0999325
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0999325
Date:13.09.2000
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0999325
Date:23.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/21]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0999325
Date:20.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:E05B81/76, E05B85/16
[2017/38]
Former International [2000/19]E05B7/00, E05B17/22, E05B47/00, E05B65/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2017/38]
Former [2001/22]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Türgriff für Kraftfahrzeug[2000/19]
English:Vehicle door handle[2000/19]
French:Poignée de porte pour véhicule[2000/19]
Examination procedure07.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/18]
19.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2007Fee for grant paid
04.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.02.2008  25.03.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG
Steeger Strasse 17
42551 Velbert / DE
Opponent's representative
Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB, et al
Rüttenscheider Straße 2
45128 Essen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/28]
Opponent(s)01  22.02.2008  25.03.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG.
Steeger Str. 17
42551 Velbert / DE
Opponent's representative
Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB, et al
Rüttenscheider Straße 2
45128 Essen / DE
Former [2008/29]
Opponent(s)01  22.02.2008  25.03.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG.
Steeger Str. 17
42551 Velbert / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Frank-Michael, et al
ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 58-64
45128 Essen / DE
Former [2008/14]
Opponent(s)01  22.02.2008   
Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG.
Steeger Str. 17
42551 Velbert / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Frank-Michael, et al
Huyssenallee 58-64
45128 Essen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
01.04.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.07.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.12.2014Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
22.03.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.05.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.05.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
08.08.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition06.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0258/15
09.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
22.03.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
22.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
31.03.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB02.11.2016
[2018/01]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0831194  (VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 29 - column 6, line 25; figures 1-9 * * column 9, line 37 - line 43 *;
 [XA]US5682135  (LABONDE DAMIEN [DE]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * [A] 2,5,7;
 [XA]DE19752974  (AISIN SEIKI K.K.) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 4,5,8;
 [A]DE4212291  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 42; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3136468  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 8-10 * page 5 - page 6; figures 1,2 *
ExaminationDE29623461U
 JPH09189156
 WO9741322
OppositionJPH0960368