Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001493

EP1001493 - Assembly comprising a holding element and a molded-in contact pin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.11.2002
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.01.2003  [2003/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harting KGaA
Postfach 11 33
32325 Espelkamp / DE
[2000/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Harting, Dietmar, Dipl.-kfm.
Schweriner Strasse 31
32339 Espelkamp / DE
02 / Heimann, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing.
General-Bishop-Strasse 21a
32339 Espelkamp / DE
03 / Ciezarek, Marek, Dipl.-Ing.
Lortzingstrasse 15
32312 Lübbecke / DE
[2000/20]
Application number, filing date99121720.903.11.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateDE199815273016.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19852730
[2000/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1001493
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1001493
Date:20.06.2001
[2001/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/405, H05K5/00, H05K5/06, H01R13/04, H01R13/52
[2001/25]
Former International [2000/20]H01R13/405, H05K5/00
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/11]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Baugruppe aus einem Halteteil und einem darin eingegossenen Kontaktstift[2000/20]
English:Assembly comprising a holding element and a molded-in contact pin[2000/20]
French:Ensemble comportant une pièce de fixation et une broche de connexion moulée dedans[2000/20]
Examination procedure21.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/02]
18.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/02]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.04.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.04.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
12.04.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2166605  (PLESSEY CO PLC) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 6;
 [A]US4537463  (COINER RUSSELL E [US], et al) [A] 1,3-5 * figure 6 *;
 [A]US4391482  (CZESCHKA FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figure 5 *;
 [A]US4480151  (DOZIER HILLIARD [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 4, line 37 - line 38 *