blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0999061

EP0999061 - Storage container for ink jet recording head cartridge and method for storing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.01.2006  [2006/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hosaka, Ken, c/o Canon K. K.
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Nakamura, Fumiharu, c/o Canon K. K.
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Yoshinari, Taiji, c/o Canon K. K.
30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/19]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/19]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99121752.203.11.1999
[2000/19]
Priority number, dateJP1998031379304.11.1998         Original published format: JP 31379398
JP1999011363621.04.1999         Original published format: JP 11363699
[2000/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0999061
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0999061
Date:18.10.2000
[2000/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2000
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/175
[2000/19]
CPC:
B41J2/17503 (EP,US); B41J2/17513 (EP,US); B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/17533 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/27]
Former [2000/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Behälter für eine Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopfkartusche und Verfahren zu seiner Lagerung[2000/19]
English:Storage container for ink jet recording head cartridge and method for storing the same[2000/19]
French:Réservoir pour cartouche montée sur une tête d'enregistrement par jet d'encre et sa méthode de stockage[2000/19]
Examination procedure28.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/17]
01.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/03]
18.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0514632  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,8,13 * page 7, line 56 - page 8, line 27 * * page 12, line 27 - page 14, line 46 * * figures 1A,9,10,19A-D,20-21 *;
 [A]EP0626264  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,8,13 * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 12 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 25 ** figures 1,3-6 *;
 [A]EP0845362  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,8,13 * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 8 * * page 10, line 4 - line 11 * * figures 1,2,4 *
by applicantJPH03176156
 JPH0640043
 JPH06183028
 JPH0717056
 JPH07125232
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.