Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000983

EP1000983 - Dye mixture, process for its preparation and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DyStar Textilfarben GmbH & Co. Deutschland KG
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2002/40]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
DyStar Textilfarben GmbH & Co. Deutschland KG
Eschenheimer Tor 2
60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schumacher, Christian, Dr.
Hornauer Strasse 41
65779 Kelkheim / DE
02 / Gröbel, Bengt-Thomas, Dr.
Am Weierberg 8
65529 Waldems / DE
03 / Schaffeld, Mieke
Paul Ehrlich Strasse 14
65520 Bad Camberg / DE
04 / Krieger, Karl
Taunussteiner Strasse 4
65510 Hünstetten / DE
05 / Röhrig, Dierk
The Hilton Residence II, Apt. 52804
Jl.Jen. Gatot Subroto, Jakarta 12040 / ID
[2000/20]
Application number, filing date99121807.404.11.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateDE199815205111.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19852051
[2000/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1000983
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1000983
Date:12.09.2001
[2001/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000983
Date:22.10.2003
Language:DE
[2003/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C09B67/22
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:Farbstoffmischung, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung[2000/20]
English:Dye mixture, process for its preparation and its use[2000/20]
French:Mélange colorant, son procédé de préparation et son utilisation[2000/20]
Examination procedure12.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/21]
29.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2003Fee for grant paid
20.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI22.10.2003
CY04.11.2003
LU04.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
[2005/23]
Former [2005/02]FI22.10.2003
CY04.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
Former [2005/01]FI22.10.2003
CY04.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/41]FI22.10.2003
CY04.11.2003
DK22.01.2004
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/36]FI22.10.2003
CY04.11.2003
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/33]FI22.10.2003
GR22.01.2004
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI22.10.2003
SE22.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE22.01.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0719841  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0668328  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 25, paragraph L * * page 27, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]EP0177449  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 23, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]DE4039406  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *