Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004258

EP1004258 - Half hollow extrusion with an attachment element slidable along the extrusion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.01.2004  [2004/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Erbslöh Aktiengesellschaft
Siebeneicker Strasse 235
42553 Velbert / DE
[2000/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Deiters, Christoph
Katernberger Schulweg 147c
42113 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Kanowski, Lothar
Krahnheide 34
42553 Velbert / DE
03 / Schreiner, Karl-Heinz
Heinrichstrasse 4
58332 Schwelm / DE
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Ernicke, Hans-Dieter
Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke
Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H.-D. Ernicke Dipl.-Ing. Klaus Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date99121829.804.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateDE1998221154U26.11.1998         Original published format: DE 29821154 U
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1004258
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004258
Date:22.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47B57/56, F16B12/32
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Halbhohlprofil mit einem längs des Hohlprofils verschiebbaren Verbindungselement[2000/22]
English:Half hollow extrusion with an attachment element slidable along the extrusion[2000/22]
French:Profilé à moitié creux avec un élément de fixation coulissant le long du profilé[2000/22]
Examination procedure05.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
09.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
01.08.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2002Fee for grant paid
23.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR22.01.2003
IE22.01.2003
DK22.04.2003
[2004/02]
Former [2003/46]GR22.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]US4575295  (REBENTISCH HUGO E [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7 * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 7; figures 1-14 *;
 [XA]EP0040180  (EBO AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 9, paragraph 6 - page 12, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 * [A] ;
 [X]US3356328  (SACHAU HELMUTH H) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 3, line 32 - line 55; figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE19633032
 DE29602843U