Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017235

EP1017235 - Method and apparatus for transmitting packet of data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2006/22]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuzuki, Kengo
1-14-15-127, Haramachida
Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0013 / JP
02 / Shinohara, Toshiaki
1-87-1-301, Miyahara-cho
Omiya-shi, Saitama-ken 330-0038 / JP
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/27]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date99121891.804.11.1999
[2000/27]
Priority number, dateJP1998035809416.12.1998         Original published format: JP 35809498
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1017235
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1017235
Date:14.07.2004
[2004/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1017235
Date:31.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.06.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/24, H04L12/64
[2004/29]
Former International [2000/27]H04N7/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2005/14]
Former [2000/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Paketdatenübertragung[2000/27]
English:Method and apparatus for transmitting packet of data[2000/27]
French:Méthode et appareil pour la transmission de packets de données[2000/27]
Examination procedure13.10.2004Examination requested  [2004/50]
19.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2006Fee for grant paid
27.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0695063  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 1, line 45 - column 6, line 20 * [A] 3,6;
 [X]WO9523495  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0828394  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *