blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1000680


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.04.2008  [2008/17]
11.02.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.03.2005  [2005/13]
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
19.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.01.2005  [2005/01]
24.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.11.2004  [2004/46]
10.09.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.10.2004  [2004/44]
06.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
16.07.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.09.2004  [2004/36]
11.06.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.07.2004  [2004/31]
28.05.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.07.2004  [2004/29]
21.05.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.07.2004  [2004/28]
27.02.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.04.2004  [2004/16]
13.02.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.03.2004  [2004/14]
30.01.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.03.2004  [2004/12]
19.01.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]
30.05.2003 (Expected) grant published on  16.07.2003  [2003/29]
23.05.2003 Change - inventor published on  09.07.2003  [2003/28]
24.04.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.01.2003 Change - representative published on  19.03.2003  [2003/12]
21.01.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.01.2003 Change - French title published on  05.03.2003  [2003/10]
22.11.2002 Renewal fee
18.10.2002 Examination report or reply
28.05.2002 Examination report or reply
22.05.2002 Change - extension states
10.04.2002 Examination report or reply
25.01.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  13.03.2002  [2002/11]
30.11.2001 First examination report
27.11.2001 Examination report or reply
22.11.2001 Renewal fee
19.10.2001 Request for examination filed published on  05.12.2001 [2001/49]
05.05.2001 Publication of search report published on  20.06.2001 [2001/25]
31.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.05.2000 [2000/20]