blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1000680
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59906292D 21.08.2003D1
Priority number Date
DE19851746 10.11.1998
DE59906292 05.11.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1000680Global Dossier 16.07.2003B1
EP1000680 20.06.2001A3
EP1000680 17.05.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE19851746 10.11.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT245061T 15.08.2003T
Priority number Date
DE19851746 10.11.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9905354 05.09.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19851746 10.11.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2289339 10.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19851746 10.11.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19851746 11.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19851746 10.11.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6374994 23.04.2002B1
Priority number Date
DE19851746 10.11.1998