Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000680

EP1000680 - Modular transport device with pivoting and linear drives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schuler Pressen GmbH & Co. KG
Bahnhofstrasse 41
73033 Göppingen / DE
[2000/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Hofele, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Liststrasse 33
73035 Göppingen / DE
02 / Dangelmayr, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing.
Lerchenweg 2
73113 Ottenbach / DE
03 / Eltze, Jürgen, Dr.-Ing.
Georg-Boehringer-Weg 72
73033 Göppingen / DE
04 / Thudium, Karl, Dipl.-Ing.
Ringstrasse 10
73116 Wäschenbeuren / DE
 [2003/28]
Former [2000/20]01 / Hofele, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Liststrasse 33
73035 Göppingen / DE
02 / Dangelmayr, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing.
Lerchenweg 2
73113 Ottenbach / DE
03 / Eltze, Jürgen, Dr.-Ing.
Georg-Boehringer-Weg 72
7303 Göppingen / DE
04 / Thudium, Karl, Dipl.-Ing.
Ringstrasse 10
73116 Wäschenbeuren / DE
Representative(s)Rüger Abel
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 04 61
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/12]Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 04 61
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
Application number, filing date99121915.505.11.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateDE199815174610.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19851746
[2000/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1000680
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1000680
Date:20.06.2001
[2001/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000680
Date:16.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:B21D43/00, B21D43/05
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:Modulare Transfereinrichtung mit Schwenk- und Linearantrieben[2000/20]
English:Modular transport device with pivoting and linear drives[2000/20]
French:Dispositif de transfer modulaire avec des entraînements pivotants et linéaires[2003/10]
Former [2000/20]Dispositif de transfer modulaire avec des entraînements pivotant et linéaire
Examination procedure10.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
30.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2003Fee for grant paid
11.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
IT16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
AT05.11.2003
CY05.11.2003
LU05.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
CH30.11.2003
LI30.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
PT16.12.2003
[2008/17]
Former [2005/13]FI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
AT05.11.2003
CY05.11.2003
LU05.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
CH30.11.2003
LI30.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
PT16.12.2003
Former [2005/02]FI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
CY05.11.2003
LU05.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
CH30.11.2003
LI30.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
PT16.12.2003
Former [2005/01]FI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
CY05.11.2003
LU05.11.2003
BE30.11.2003
CH30.11.2003
LI30.11.2003
PT16.12.2003
Former [2004/46]FI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
ES27.10.2003
CY05.11.2003
LU05.11.2003
CH30.11.2003
LI30.11.2003
PT16.12.2003
Former [2004/44]FI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
CY05.11.2003
LU05.11.2003
CH30.11.2003
LI30.11.2003
PT16.12.2003
Former [2004/39]FI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
CY05.11.2003
LU05.11.2003
PT16.12.2003
Former [2004/36]FI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
CY05.11.2003
PT16.12.2003
Former [2004/31]FI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
PT16.12.2003
Former [2004/29]FI16.07.2003
IE16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
DK16.10.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
Former [2004/16]FI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
GR16.10.2003
SE16.10.2003
Former [2004/14]FI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
GR16.10.2003
Former [2004/12]FI16.07.2003
NL16.07.2003
Former [2004/10]NL16.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19654475  (SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 5, lines 11-54; figures 3,4 *