Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004768

EP1004768 - Heating device for the interior of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Heddram, Marco
Maschhop 32
38536 Meinersen / DE
[2000/22]
Application number, filing date99122012.011.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateDE199815411924.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19854119
DE199913523628.07.1999         Original published format: DE 19935236
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004768
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004768
Date:27.09.2000
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004768
Date:12.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02N11/08, B60H1/04
[2000/39]
Former International [2000/22]F02N11/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Heizungsanlage für den Innenraum eines Fahrzeuges[2000/22]
English:Heating device for the interior of a vehicle[2000/22]
French:Dispositif de chauffage pour l'intérieur d'un véhicule[2000/22]
Examination procedure27.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
03.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2004Fee for grant paid
15.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
IT12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
PT12.10.2004
AT11.11.2004
LU11.11.2004
BE30.11.2004
CH30.11.2004
LI30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/18]CY12.05.2004
FI12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
AT11.11.2004
LU11.11.2004
BE30.11.2004
CH30.11.2004
LI30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/13]FI12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
AT11.11.2004
BE30.11.2004
CH30.11.2004
LI30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/12]FI12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
NL12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
BE30.11.2004
CH30.11.2004
LI30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/51]FI12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
BE30.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/48]FI12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/19]FI12.05.2004
IE12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
Former [2005/18]FI12.05.2004
DK12.08.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
Former [2005/06]FI12.05.2004
GR12.08.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
Former [2005/02]FI12.05.2004
SE12.08.2004
ES23.08.2004
Former [2004/52]SE12.08.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US5317998  (HANSON JAY L [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE3215642  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4883226  (TOMITA ITIZO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *