Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001550

EP1001550 - Sequential detection system and method with adaptive bias [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2006
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.05.2006  [2006/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Somayazulu, Srinivasa V.
12910 SW Winterlake Drive
Tigard, OR 97233 / US
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date99122030.212.11.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateUS1998019146112.11.1998         Original published format: US 191461
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1001550
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1001550
Date:16.04.2003
[2003/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1001550
Date:08.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/707
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/02]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Sequentielles Detektionssystem und Verfahren mit anpassbarem Arbeitspunkt[2000/20]
English:Sequential detection system and method with adaptive bias[2000/20]
French:Système de détection séquentielle et procédé avec polarisation adaptative[2000/20]
Examination procedure22.08.2003Examination requested  [2003/43]
17.10.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
05.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2005Fee for grant paid
01.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.11.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.11.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0852430  (YOZAN INC [JP]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * figures 3-5 * * figure 7 * * column 4, line 16 - line 20 * * column 7, line 36 - line 41 * * column 8, line 1 - column 9, line 20 * * column 10, line 9 - line 13 * * column 10, line 21 - line 23 *;
 [X]EP0825737  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 15 * figure 17 * * figure 2 * * figure 9 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 31 * * column 14, line 26 - column 15, line 2 * * column 24, line 7 - line 39 * * column 24, line 49 - line 52 *
Examination   RAPPAPORT S.S.; GRIECO D.M., "Spread Spectrum Signal Acquisition: Methods and Technology", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, (19840601), vol. 22, no. 6, pages 6 - 21, XP000560546

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.1984.1091978