Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0985903

EP0985903 - Three-dimensional measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Maruyama, Tsugito, Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8858 / JP
02 / Kanda, Shinji, Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8858 / JP
03 / Wakitani, Jun, Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8858 / JP
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99122065.819.06.1991
[2000/11]
Priority number, dateJP1990015879919.06.1990         Original published format: JP 15879990
JP1990016556026.06.1990         Original published format: JP 16556090
JP1990027766018.10.1990         Original published format: JP 27766090
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0985903
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0985903
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0985903
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01B11/24, G01S17/89
[2000/16]
Former International [2000/11]G01B11/24
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/13]
Former [2000/11]DE,  FR,  GB,  NL 
TitleGerman:Apparat zur dreidimensionalen Messung[2000/11]
English:Three-dimensional measuring apparatus[2000/11]
French:Appareil de mesure tridimensionelle[2000/11]
Examination procedure07.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
13.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2002Fee for grant paid
25.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP91110071.7  / EP0462595
EP95103248.1  / EP0660079
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 11
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[YP]WO9012280  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [YP] 1,4,6 * page 2, line 27 - page 6, line 3; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US4722605  (LIVNAT AMINADAV [IL], et al) [Y] 1,4,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3602995  (MATSUMOTO GORO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * page 11, line 26 - page 13, line 26 * * page 19, line 25 - page 26, line 6; figures 1-15 *
 [YPA]  - JUN'ICHI YAMAGUCHI ET AL, "A 3-D SHAPE IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM USING A FIBER GRATING VISION SENSOR", SIGNAL PROCESSING AND SYSTEM CONTROL, FACTORY AUTOMATION, PACIFIC GROVE, NOV. 27 - 30, 1990, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19901127), VOL. 1, no. CONF. 16, pages 507 - 511, XP000217282 [YP] 1,4,5 * the whole document * [AP] 3
 [YA]  - DIRCKX J J J ET AL, "AUTOMATIC CALIBRATION METHOD FOR PHASE SHIFT SHADOW MOIRE INTERFEROMETRY", APPLIED OPTICS, NEW YORK,USA, (19900401), vol. 29, no. 10, pages 1474 - 1476, XP000104578 [Y] 1,4,5 * the whole document * [A] 3

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.29.001474