Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000565

EP1000565 - Toothbrush [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Euler, Heinrich Georg
Distelweg 7
51147 Köln / DE
[2000/20]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/20]
Representative(s)RGTH
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet
Neuer Wall 10
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99122105.205.11.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateDE1998220182U11.11.1998         Original published format: DE 29820182 U
DE1999217295U01.10.1999         Original published format: DE 29917295 U
[2000/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1000565
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1000565
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000565
Date:10.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:A46B5/00
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:Zahnbürste[2000/20]
English:Toothbrush[2000/20]
French:Brosse à dents[2000/20]
Examination procedure17.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
04.11.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
28.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
07.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2001Fee for grant paid
15.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI10.04.2002
GR10.04.2002
IE10.04.2002
DK10.07.2002
PT10.07.2002
SE10.07.2002
LU05.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2004/39]GR10.04.2002
IE10.04.2002
DK10.07.2002
PT10.07.2002
SE10.07.2002
LU05.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
Former [2004/10]GR10.04.2002
IE10.04.2002
DK10.07.2002
PT10.07.2002
SE10.07.2002
CY30.11.2002
Former [2003/46]GR10.04.2002
IE10.04.2002
DK10.07.2002
PT10.07.2002
SE10.07.2002
Former [2003/21]GR10.04.2002
IE10.04.2002
PT10.07.2002
SE10.07.2002
Former [2003/19]GR10.04.2002
IE10.04.2002
SE10.07.2002
Former [2003/17]IE10.04.2002
SE10.07.2002
Former [2002/42]SE10.07.2002
Documents cited:Search[PA]WO9916332  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [PA] 1,2 * page 8, line 14 - page 14, line 12; figure - *;
 [PA]WO9939610  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM GMBH AND CO [DE], et al) [PA] 1,2 * page 7, line 27 - page 11, line 9; figure - *;
 [A]DE8609802U  (SEIB) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0462509  (HEUCKMANN ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 45 - column 7, line 2; figure - *