Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003208

EP1003208 - Integrated circuit having self-aligned hydrogen barrier layer and method for fabricating same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYMETRIX CORPORATION
5055 Mark Dabling Boulevard
Colorado Springs, CO 80918 / US
For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
SYMETRIX CORPORATION
5055 Mark Dabling Boulevard
Colorado Springs, CO 80918 / US
For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Cuchiaro, Joseph D.
2545 Rossmere Street
Colorado Springs, Colorado 80918 / US
02 / Paz de Araujo, Carlos A.
317 W. Sunbird Cliffs Lane
Colorado Springs, Colorado 80819 / US
03 / Furuya, Akira, c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-01 / JP
04 / Miyasaka, Yoichi, c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-01 / JP
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date99122247.208.11.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateUS1998019738520.11.1998         Original published format: US 197385
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1003208
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1003208
Date:11.06.2003
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/28, H01L21/02, H01L21/8246, H01L27/115
[2003/24]
Former International [2000/21]H01L21/28
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/10]
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Integrierte Schaltung mit selbstausgerichteter Wasserstoffbariereschicht und Herstellungsmethode[2000/21]
English:Integrated circuit having self-aligned hydrogen barrier layer and method for fabricating same[2000/21]
French:Circuit intégré ayant une couche de barrière à l'hydrogène auto-alignée et son procédé de fabrication[2000/21]
Examination procedure26.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/05]
31.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/49]
05.07.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5046043  (MILLER WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * page 2; claim - *;
 [A]US5716875  (JONES JR ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5654456  (SCOTT MICHAEL C [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 5; figures 2,4,5 * * abstract *;
 [DA]US5434102  (WATANABE HITOSHI [US], et al) [DA] 1,12 * column 3 - column 4 * * column 7 - column 9; figure 3 *;
 [PX]EP0954031  (SYMETRIX CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0951058  (SYMETRIX CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [A]  BHATT H D ET AL, "NOVEL HIGH TEMPERATURE MULTILAYER ELECTRODE-BARRIER STRUCTURE FOR HIGH-DENSITY FERROELECTRIC MEMORIES", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19970804), vol. 71, no. 5, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 719 - 721, XP000699640 [A] 1,12 * page 719, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2; figure 1B *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.119840