blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1002999

EP1002999 - Control of the burner heating power with a gas fuelled range or stove [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 29.12.2004  [2004/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2004/05]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rothenberger, Gerhard
Josef-Hollerbach-Strasse 21
76571 Gaggenau / DE
02 / Weiss, Dieter
Johann-Fraass-Strasse 16c
77815 Bühl / DE
[2000/21]
Application number, filing date99122259.708.11.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateDE199815326218.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19853262
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1002999
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1002999
Date:15.01.2003
[2003/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2002
ClassificationIPC:F23N5/18, F23N1/00
[2003/03]
CPC:
F23N5/184 (EP,US); F23N2005/185 (EP,US); F23N2235/16 (EP,US);
F23N2241/08 (EP,US); Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/21]F23N5/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/40]
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Regelung der Brennerheizleistung bei einem gasbetriebenen Koch- oder Backgerät[2000/21]
English:Control of the burner heating power with a gas fuelled range or stove[2000/21]
French:Commande de la puissance d'un brûleur d' un appareil de cuisson à gaz[2000/21]
Examination procedure15.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/37]
06.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5779466  (OKAMURA CHUICHI [JP]) [X] 1,7 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 65; figure 6; claims 1,2 * * the whole document * [Y] 2-6,8-16;
 [XY]US4111637  (HILLMAN II WILLIAM S) [X] 1,7 * column 3, line 39 - column 3, line 63; figure 1; claims 1,10 * [Y] 2-6,8-16;
 [XY]JPH0842847  ;
 [X]SU1126775  (DO NII CHERNOJ METALLURGII [SU]) [X] 1,5-7,12,15,16 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4654813  (EDLUND CARL E [US], et al) [Y] 2,8,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 27 - column 1, line 49; figure 1 * * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 3 *;
 [Y]EP0869335  (WAGNER INT [CH]) [Y] 2,8,9 * column 3, line 5 - column 3, line 27 *;
 [Y]US4250553  (FISHER CHESTER G [US], et al) [Y] 2,8,9 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 31; figures 2-4 *;
 [Y]US4449402  (EIERMANN KURT [DE], et al) [Y] 3,4,10,11 * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 31 * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 15 *;
 [Y]US4245502  (EIERMANN KURT, et al) [Y] 3,4,10,11 * column 2, line 3 - column 2, line 43 *;
 [Y]US4930488  (PEARMAN A NOEL J [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,14-16 * abstract * * column 5, line 3 - column 5, line 10 * * column 6, line 50 - column 6, line 62 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08042847 A 19960216 (RINNAI CORP) [X] 1,7 * abstract * [Y] 2-6,8-16
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.