Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1099430

EP1099430 - Knee prosthesis system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WALDEMAR LINK GmbH & Co. KG
Barkhausenweg 10
22339 Hamburg / DE
[2003/49]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
Waldemar Link (GmbH & Co.)
Barkhausenweg 10
22339 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Keller, Arnold
An der Naherfurth 5
23863 Kayhude / DE
 [2001/20]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99122314.009.11.1999
[2001/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1099430
Date:16.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1099430
Date:04.02.2004
Language:DE
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/46, A61B17/15, A61F2/38
[2001/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/20]
TitleGerman:Knieprothesensystem[2001/20]
English:Knee prosthesis system[2001/20]
French:Système pour une prothèse de genou[2001/20]
Examination procedure31.05.2000Examination requested  [2001/20]
02.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2003Fee for grant paid
26.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
NL04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
PT04.07.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/18]CY04.02.2004
FI04.02.2004
NL04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
Former [2006/12]FI04.02.2004
NL04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
Former [2005/02]FI04.02.2004
DK04.05.2004
GR04.05.2004
Former [2004/41]FI04.02.2004
GR04.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI04.02.2004
Documents cited:Search[DYA]US3949428  (CAVENDISH MICHAEL EDWARD, et al) [DY] 1,2,6 * figures 1A-1C,3,4 * * column 3, line 11 - line 23 * * column 5, line 19 - line 29 * * column 5, line 42 - line 61 * [A] 9,14;
 [Y]WO7900739  (BIOMEDICAL ENG CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,6 * figures 34,36,60 * * page 20, line 11 - line 20 * * page 25, line 1 - line 12 * * page 39, line 34 - page 40, line 19 *;
 [A]FR2589720  (AUBANIAC JEAN [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,13,15 * * abstract *;
 [DA]EP0824904  (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]) [DA] 1,6 * figure 3 * * column 3, line 15 - line 58 *
by applicantUS4081866
 DE6949817U
 EP0824904
 US3728742