Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002960

EP1002960 - Pressing pressure control device for a tool or a tool part of an IS glass machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GPS GLASPRODUKTIONS-SERVICE GMBH
Ruhrglasstrasse 50
45329 Essen / DE
[2000/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Emrath, Norbert
Humbusch 25
45721 Haltern / DE
02 / Springer, Hans-Dieter
Friedholt 81
46348 Raesfeld / DE
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz , et al
Patentanwälte Spalthoff und Lelgemann
Huyssenallee 70/72
45128 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/06]Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Spalthoff und Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20
45074 Essen / DE
Former [2000/21]Spalthoff, Adolf
Spalthoff, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing. Lelgemann, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., Haumannplatz 4
45130 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date99122436.111.11.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateDE1998220590U18.11.1998         Original published format: DE 29820590 U
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1002960
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1002960
Date:18.07.2001
[2001/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002960
Date:05.01.2005
Language:DE
[2005/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:F15B11/028, F15B15/20, C03B11/00
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:Pressdruckregelvorrichtung für einen Antriebszylinder eines Werkzeugs oder Werkzeugteils einer IS-Glasmaschine[2000/21]
English:Pressing pressure control device for a tool or a tool part of an IS glass machine[2000/21]
French:Dispositif pour le réglage de pression de presse pour un outil ou une partie d'un outil d'une machine pour la fabrication de verre[2000/21]
Examination procedure20.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/09]
12.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2004Fee for grant paid
24.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI05.01.2005
IE05.01.2005
NL05.01.2005
DK05.04.2005
GR05.04.2005
[2006/14]
Former [2006/13]FI05.01.2005
IE05.01.2005
NL05.01.2005
DK05.04.2005
Former [2006/12]FI05.01.2005
DK05.04.2005
Former [2005/46]FI05.01.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]US4662923  (VAJDA VLADIMIR [CH], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 7, lines 36-59 - column 8, lines 18-20 *;
 [X]DE3418261  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-10 * Seite 16 zwei letzte Zeile *;
 [X]JPH0733455  ;
 [X]DE1696047  (WALTER MASCH J) [X] 1-10 * page 2 - pages 8-9 *;
 [A]WO9818732  (LYNCH MACHINERY INC [US]) [A] * pages 1-2 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, [X] 1-10 * abstract *