blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1002961 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1002961



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 93
17.11.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.12.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.10.2003 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 1
18.10.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
18.10.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
11.07.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
11.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
03.07.2003 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
03.07.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
03.07.2003 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.06.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.06.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
24.06.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
04.11.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
15.10.2002 Request for change of name Search / examination 5
21.05.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.04.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
03.04.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.04.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
12.04.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
12.11.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
12.11.1999 Description Search / examination 15
12.11.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.11.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
12.11.1999 Priority document Search / examination 20
12.11.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6