blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1002961
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59908298D 19.02.2004D1
Priority number Date
DE19853739 21.11.1998
DE59908298 12.11.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1002961Global Dossier 14.01.2004B1
EP1002961 15.05.2002A3
EP1002961 24.05.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE19853739 21.11.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT257914T 15.01.2004T
Priority number Date
DE19853739 21.11.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19853739 25.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19853739 21.11.1998