Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002961

EP1002961 - Process for controlling electrically-operated switching valves [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bosch Rexroth AG
Zum Eisengiesser 1
97816 Lohr am Main / DE
[2002/51]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
Mannesmann Rexroth AG
Jahnstrasse 3 - 5
97816 Lohr am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Keller, Dieter
Heinestrasse 4
97209 Veitshöchheim / DE
02 / Stitz, Matthias
Gellenäckerweg 7
97816 Lohr/Main / DE
[2000/21]
Application number, filing date99122530.112.11.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateDE199815373921.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19853739
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1002961
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1002961
Date:15.05.2002
[2002/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002961
Date:14.01.2004
Language:DE
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:F15B13/00, F15B21/08, G11C7/10
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2003/35]
Former [2003/31]DE,  FI,  FR,  GB,  IT,  SE 
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Ansteuerung von elektrisch betätigten Schaltventilen[2000/21]
English:Process for controlling electrically-operated switching valves[2000/21]
French:Procédé pour la commande de soupapes de commutation à actionnement électrique[2000/21]
Examination procedure24.10.2002Examination requested  [2003/01]
24.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2003Fee for grant paid
23.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI14.01.2004
FR14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
IT14.01.2004
SE14.04.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]FI14.01.2004
FR14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
SE14.04.2004
Former [2004/45]FI14.01.2004
GB14.01.2004
SE14.04.2004
Former [2004/40]FI14.01.2004
SE14.04.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19606673  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * column 1, line 50 - line 64 * * column 2, line 60 - line 66 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9619027  (FESTO KG ;HENZLER MAGNUS (DE); STOLL KURT (DE); DEMUTH STEFAN JOHA) [A] 1 * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 13 *;
 [A]DE19647215  (FESTO KG) [A] 2-4 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 22; figures 1,3 *