Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1028406

EP1028406 - System and methods for constructive-dialogic learning [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004Change - withdrawalpublished on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Strohecker, Carol
295 Harvard Street 702
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
02 / Agarwala, Aseem
372 Memorial Drive
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
03 / Ackermann, Edith
67 Dana Street 4
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner
Mozartstrasse 17
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99122571.512.11.1999
[2000/33]
Priority number, dateUS1999024696209.02.1999         Original published format: US 246962
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1028406
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/33]
ClassificationInternational:G09B7/04, G09B5/06, G09B5/02
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/33]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zu einem konstruktiven dialogischen Lernen[2000/33]
English:System and methods for constructive-dialogic learning[2000/33]
French:Systèmes et procédés pour un apprentissage constructif dialogué[2000/33]
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/30]
30.04.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05