Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1099506 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1099506



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1469
18.01.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
20.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.09.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.09.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.09.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
15.09.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.09.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.08.2016 Citation for the examination procedure Appeal 2
03.08.2016 Letter to the Legal Division Appeal 1
18.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.07.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.07.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
15.07.2016 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 3
12.07.2016 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 4
12.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.07.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
06.07.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2016 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Appeal 1
18.06.2016 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 2
18.06.2016 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 2
18.06.2016 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.06.2016 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Appeal 2
18.06.2016 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Appeal 2
14.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
13.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
13.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
11.06.2016 Claims Appeal 5
11.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
10.06.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
10.06.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
09.05.2016 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
22.04.2016 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
21.01.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
21.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.2015 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 1
27.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.11.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
25.11.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
25.11.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
20.11.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.11.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
05.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.09.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 7
04.09.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 7
02.07.2015 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
02.07.2015 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.06.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
19.05.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
01.04.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.11.2012 Claims Appeal 5
16.11.2012 Claims Appeal 5
16.11.2012 Claims Appeal 5
16.11.2012 Claims Appeal 5
16.11.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
16.11.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
14.11.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 21
04.07.2012 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
04.07.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 17
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 26
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 14
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 12
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 20
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 17
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 36
26.06.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
26.06.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 13
26.06.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 6
26.06.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
26.06.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 18
30.04.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
26.04.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
26.04.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.04.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.04.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.04.2012 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
23.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.03.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
21.02.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
21.02.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
21.02.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.01.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.12.2011 Claims Opposition 5
24.12.2011 Claims Opposition 5
24.12.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
24.12.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
24.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
24.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
23.12.2011 Claims Opposition 5
23.12.2011 Claims Opposition 5
23.12.2011 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
23.12.2011 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
17.10.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.10.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.10.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.10.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.10.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 9
06.10.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2011 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
22.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2011 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
22.06.2011 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
18.06.2011 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 11
18.06.2011 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
17.06.2011 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 11
17.06.2011 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
12.04.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
12.04.2011 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
12.04.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.02.2011 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.12.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
01.12.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 12
14.10.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
11.10.2010 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 1
11.10.2010 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
16.09.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.09.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.09.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.09.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.08.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
05.08.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.08.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.07.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 5
29.07.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.07.2010 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.07.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.07.2010 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
15.07.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.05.2010 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 5
11.03.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
08.03.2010 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
06.08.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.07.2009 Reply to appeal Appeal 6
23.03.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.03.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
17.03.2009 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
16.03.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
19.01.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
14.01.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.01.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
26.11.2008 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Opposition 1
19.11.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.11.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.11.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.11.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2008 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
07.11.2008 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
07.11.2008 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 11
07.11.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.11.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
06.11.2008 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.11.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2008 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
06.11.2008 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.11.2008 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.10.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.10.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
15.10.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
11.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.10.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.09.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
24.09.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
24.09.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
24.09.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2008 Claims Opposition 4
16.09.2008 Claims Opposition 4
16.09.2008 Claims Opposition 5
16.09.2008 Claims Opposition 4
16.09.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
15.09.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.09.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
15.09.2008 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.09.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
14.09.2008 Claims Opposition 5
14.09.2008 Claims Opposition 4
14.09.2008 Claims Opposition 4
14.09.2008 Claims Opposition 4
14.09.2008 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
17.06.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.06.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.06.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.06.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.06.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.06.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.06.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.06.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.06.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
02.06.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
02.06.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
02.06.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
02.06.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
02.06.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
02.06.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
02.06.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.06.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2008 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.05.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
13.05.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.05.2008 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 8
07.05.2008 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 8
06.05.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.05.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.05.2008 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 8
02.05.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.04.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
29.04.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.04.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2008 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
18.04.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
18.04.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
18.04.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
18.04.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
18.04.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 6
18.04.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 3
18.04.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
18.04.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
18.04.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.04.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
14.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2007 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
06.06.2007 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
03.05.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
19.04.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
19.04.2007 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
16.04.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.04.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
05.04.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.04.2007 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.11.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
28.11.2006 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
28.11.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
17.03.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
07.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.01.2006 Fax filed during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.10.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
11.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.10.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
10.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
10.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.10.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
19.08.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.08.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.08.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.08.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.04.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.04.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
11.03.2005 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 21
11.03.2005 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
11.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
11.03.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.03.2005 Non-scannable object Opposition 13
11.03.2005 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
11.03.2005 Non-scannable object Opposition 6
11.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
11.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
11.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
11.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
11.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
11.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
11.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
09.03.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.03.2005 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 21
22.04.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.04.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.04.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
01.04.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
04.12.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
04.12.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
04.12.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
20.11.2003 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
01.07.2003 Claims Search / examination 5
01.07.2003 Description Search / examination 10
01.07.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.06.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 16
21.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.02.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.07.2002 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
18.03.2002 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
28.12.2001 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
29.06.2001 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
22.05.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.04.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.04.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.04.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
24.03.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.03.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
16.02.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.02.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.01.2000 Invitation to pay filing fee/search fee with additional fee Search / examination 2
17.11.1999 Abstract Search / examination 2
17.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 6
17.11.1999 Description Search / examination 11
17.11.1999 Drawings Search / examination 4
17.11.1999 Drawings Search / examination 4
17.11.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
12.11.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7
12.11.1999 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 23