EP1000586 - Medical aspiration device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATMOS MedizinTechnik GmbH & Co. KG Ludwig-Kegel-Strasse 16 79853 Lenzkirch / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states ATMOS MEDIZINTECHNIK GmbH & Co. Ludwig-Kegel-Strasse 16 79853 Lenzkirch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möller, Mario Göschweilerstrasse 1 79843 Löffingen / DE | 02 /
Rheiner, Norbert, Dipl.-Ing.(BA) Waldstrasse 27 79848 Bonndorf / DE | 03 /
Beller, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Uhlandstrasse 11 72810 Gomaringen / DE | 04 /
Kühner, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Osterbronnstrasse 64B 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122610.1 | 13.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | DE1998152706 | 16.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19852706 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1000586 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1000586 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/00 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
A61B18/00 (EP);
A61B2218/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2001/42] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Absaugvorrichtgung für Chirurgiegeräte | [2000/20] | English: | Medical aspiration device | [2000/20] | French: | Dispositif chirurgical d'aspiration | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/30] | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.09.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.09.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9714364 (DONALDSON CO INC) [X] 1-4 * page 14, line 26 - page 16, line 26; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US5336218 (LINHARES STEPHEN J) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [DX]US5620441 (GREFF RICHARD J ET AL) [DX] 1-4 * column 3, line 29 - line 67; figure 1 *; | [A]US5613966 (MAKOWER JOSHUA ET AL) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]WO9804200 (NYMAN SVEN OLOF) [A] 1,7 * page 11, line 13 - line 20; figure 5B * |