Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990390

EP0990390 - Novel process and composition for controlling weeds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.07.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 11.09.2002  [2002/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mycogen Corporation
5501 Oberlin Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2000/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Caulder, Jerry
5875 Ciudad Leon Drive
San Diego, CA 92120 / US
02 / Crowley, R Hugh
Route 4, Box 589
Mena, AR 71953 / US
03 / Zorner, Paul S
2939 Segovia Way
La Costa, CA 92609 / US
04 / Evans, Steven L
11578, Windcrest Lane
No. 1813, San Diego, CA / US
[2000/38]
Former [2000/14]01 / Caulder, Jerry
5875 Ciudad Leon Drive
San Diego, CA 92120 / US
02 / Crowley, R Hugh
761 Masters Drive
Oceanside, CA 92057 / US
03 / Zorner, Paul S
2939 Segovia Way
La Costa, CA 92609 / US
04 / Evans, Steven L
11578, Windcrest Lane
No. 1813, San Diego, CA / US
Representative(s)Hucker, Charlotte Jane
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Hucker, Charlotte Jane
Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99122665.501.01.1992
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateUS1991063870808.01.1991         Original published format: US 638708
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990390
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A01N37/02
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/51]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Neues Verfahren und Zusammensetzung zur Unkrautbekämpfung[2000/14]
English:Novel process and composition for controlling weeds[2000/14]
French:Nouveau procédé et composition pour contrôler les mauvaises herbes[2000/14]
Examination procedure25.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
27.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
09.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/37]
19.04.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/37]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP91121146.4  / EP0494386
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
25.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]WO8903178  (SAFER INC [US]) [X] 1,3-9,11 * claim - *;
 [X]EP0115622  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,9,11 * claim - *;
 [X]US4134754  (HOFFMANN OTTO L) [X] 1,3,5,9,11 * claim - *;
 [X]US2622975  (ZIMMERMAN PERCY W, et al) [X] 1-6,9,11 * column 2, line 28 - line 35 *;
 [X]JPS61289004  ;
 [XD]JPS61106501  ;
 [X]JPS59193809
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 05, Database accession no. 1987-032875, XP002128101 & JPS61289004 A 19861219 (KAO CORP) [X] 1,3-9,11 * abstract *
 [XD]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 27, Database accession no. 1986-173305, XP002128102 & JPS61106501 A 19860524 (TEIJIN LTD) [XD] 1,3,5,6,9,11 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 50, Database accession no. 1984-309683, XP002128103 & JPS59193809 A 19841102 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-6,9,11 * abstract *