Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004947

EP1004947 - Fast correction mechanism for calendar watch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.10.2009
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Patek, Philippe SA
41, rue du Rhône
1204 Genève / CH
[2007/52]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
PATEK PHILIPPE S.A.
141, chemin du Pont- du-Centenaire
1228 Plan-Les- Ouates / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BUCLIN, Paul
Rue de Troinex, 79
1256 TROINEX / CH
02 / FAGUE, Cédric
Bernex-en-Combes 9
1233 BERNEX / CH
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Micheli & Cie SA
Rue de Genève 122
Case Postale 61
1226 Genève-Thônex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Micheli & Cie
Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61
1226 Genève-Thonex / CH
Application number, filing date99122717.416.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateCH1998000235627.11.1998         Original published format: CH 235698
[2000/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004947
Date:31.05.2000
Language:FR
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004947
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004947
Date:10.12.2008
Language:FR
[2008/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G04B19/24, G04B3/04
[2001/15]
Former International [2000/22]G04B19/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Schneller Korrekturmechanismus für Kalenderuhr[2000/22]
English:Fast correction mechanism for calendar watch[2000/22]
French:Mecanisme de correction rapide du quantieme pour mouvement d'horlogerie muni d'un quantieme[2000/22]
Examination procedure03.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/44]
06.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2008Fee for grant paid
04.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
20.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
18.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
18.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.12.2008
CY10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IE10.12.2008
IT10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
SE10.03.2009
GR11.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
PT11.05.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/25]AT10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IE10.12.2008
IT10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
SE10.03.2009
GR11.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
PT11.05.2009
Former [2010/06]AT10.12.2008
DK10.12.2008
FI10.12.2008
IE10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
SE10.03.2009
ES21.03.2009
PT11.05.2009
Former [2009/30]FI10.12.2008
NL10.12.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2165705  (LORFRANCE SARL) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2165705
    FRANÇOIS LECOULTRE, Les montres compliquées, pages 206 - 230,