Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004344

EP1004344 - Process for purifying gases and absorbent therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/22]Process for purifying gases
[2003/02]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.06.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.08.2004  [2004/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clariant GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2000/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Stankowiak, Achim, Dr
Carl-Orff-Strasse 4
84503 Altötting / DE
02 / Streitberger, Horst
Josef-Hofmiller-Weg 9
85403 Altötting / DE
03 / Wyschofsky, Michael
Ostwall 29
44135 Dortmund / DE
[2000/22]
Application number, filing date99122830.517.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateDE199815435325.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19854353
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1004344
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004344
Date:13.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/14
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [2003/15]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Reinigung von Gasen und dazu geeignete Absorptionsflüssigkeit[2003/02]
English:Process for purifying gases and absorbent therefor[2003/02]
French:Procédé pour la purification de gaz et absorbant approprié[2003/02]
Former [2000/22]Verfahren zur Reinigung von Gasen
Former [2000/22]Process for purifying gases
Former [2000/22]Procédé pour la purification de gaz
Examination procedure30.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
17.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2003Fee for grant paid
14.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US4705673  (CAPOBIANCO PAUL J [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 5, line 6 - column 9, line 62 *;
 [X]DE3922904  (CASSELLA AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0452694  (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA [US]) [A] 11,12 * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 18 *;
 [DA]WO9513128  (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [DA] 1-13 * claim - *