Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002905

EP1002905 - Rainwater collection and distribution system with high hydrostatic pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Luber, Norbert
Wilhelm-Busch-Strasse 6
92237 Sulzbach-Rosenberg / DE
[2000/21]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Dreykorn-Lindner, Werner
Patentanwalt
Steinlachstrasse 2
90571 Schwaig / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Dreykorn-Lindner, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Steinlachstrasse 2
90571 Schwaig / DE
Application number, filing date99122854.517.11.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateDE199815374021.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19853740
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1002905
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1002905
Date:07.11.2001
[2001/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:E03B1/04, E03B3/03
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:Regenwassersammel- und Verteilsystem mit hohem hydrostatischen Druck[2000/21]
English:Rainwater collection and distribution system with high hydrostatic pressure[2000/21]
French:Système collecteur et distributeur pour eaux de pluie à haute pression hydrostatique[2000/21]
Examination procedure07.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/21]
24.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/03]
17.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US4726151  (VITALE BENEDETTO A [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 1 - line 11; figure 2 *;
 [X]GB2220223  (LONG JACK) [X] 1,6,8 * page 4, line 12 - page 7, line 18; figure 1 *;
 [DX]DE19647351  (HAFNER JAPPE RUDOLF [DE], et al) [DX] 1 * column 5, line 3 - line 16; figure - *;
 [X]GB2321926  (PAYNE STEPHEN JOHN [GB]) [X] 1,10,11 * page 5, line 11 - line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3139304  (KULLMANN HUBERT) [A] 4 * figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE3010290
 DE9300620U
 DE8915204U
 DE3139304
 DE4237201
 DE19647351
 DE4311565