Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043251

EP1043251 - Method, device and transport hanger for automatically transferring clothing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.10.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.12.2004  [2004/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paulsen, Wolfgang
Fritz-Reuter-Strasse 14
25358 Horst / DE
For all designated states
Hennig, Claus
Blink 26
25491 Hetlingen / DE
For all designated states
Kipp, Jörg
Pinneberger Strasse 227A
25488 Holm / DE
For all designated states
Behrens, Thorsten
Birkhahnweg 1 a
22880 Wedel / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
Paulsen, Wolfgang
Fritz-Reuter-Strasse 14
25358 Horst / DE
For all designated states
Hennig, Claus
Blink 26
25491 Hetlingen / DE
For all designated states
Kipp, Jörg
Am Leuchtturm 8
22559 Hamburg / DE
For all designated states
Behrens, Thorsten
Birkhahnweg 1 a
22880 Wedel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/41]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2004/14]
Former [2000/41]Heldt, Gert, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Grosse Bleichen 12
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99122935.218.11.1999
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateDE199815369920.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19853699
DE199815643108.12.1998         Original published format: DE 19856431
[2000/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043251
Date:11.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043251
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65G47/61, A47G25/44, D06F95/00
[2001/20]
Former International [2000/41]B65G47/61
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
TitleGerman:Verfahren, Anordnung und Transportbügel zum automatischen Übergeben von Bekleidungsstücken[2000/41]
English:Method, device and transport hanger for automatically transferring clothing[2000/41]
French:Procédé, dispositif et cintre transporteur pour le transfer automatique de cintres[2000/41]
Examination procedure25.04.2000Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
16.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/05]
02.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/51]
16.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/51]
Request for further processing for:26.05.2000Request for further processing filed
26.05.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.08.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200103   M06   Not yet paid
30.11.200204   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.2003
30.11.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0346780  (CORONET KUNSTSTOFFWERK GMBH [DE]) [X] 12-15 * column 10, line 43 - column 11, line 27 * * figures 6-8 * [A] 16-19;
 [DA]EP0301476  (KLEINDIENST GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * column 7, line 3 - column 10, line 13 * * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]WO9110610  (JENSEN AG BURGDORF [CH]) [A] 1,5,9 * page 5, line 2 - page 8, line 16 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]DE4405458  (JENSEN AG BURGDORF [CH]) [A] 1,5 * column 4, line 52 - column 6, line 41 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5076417  (SANTICCHI AUGUSTO [IT]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 67 - column 5, line 11 * * column 5, line 18 - column 7, line 15 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 40 * * figures 1-11 *;
 [A]EP0812556  (LAM PETER A [US]) [A] 9,10 * column 3, line 21 - line 34 * * column 10, line 32 - column 11, line 32 * * column 13, line 2 - line 46 * * figures 1,12,13,21,22 *;
 [E]DE19856431  (PAULSEN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [E] 1-10 * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 17 * * figures 1-5 *