Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1026093

EP1026093 - Two-component container and method for making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GOLDWELL GmbH
Zerninstrasse 10-18
64297 Darmstadt / DE
[2001/21]
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
GOLDWELL GmbH
Zerninstrasse 10-18
D-64297 Darmstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lamboy, Peter
Lärchenweg 17
64331 Weiterstadt / DE
[2000/32]
Application number, filing date99122986.519.11.1999
[2000/32]
Priority number, dateDE199910296226.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19902962
[2000/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1026093
Date:09.08.2000
Language:DE
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1026093
Date:23.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP26.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65D25/08, B65D23/08
[2000/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/32]
TitleGerman:Zweikomponentenbehältnis und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[2000/32]
English:Two-component container and method for making the same[2000/32]
French:Récipient à deux composants et son procédé de fabrication[2000/32]
Examination procedure06.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
06.05.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
13.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
04.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.11.2000Fee for grant paid
10.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY23.05.2001
FI23.05.2001
IE23.05.2001
IT23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
GR24.08.2001
LU19.11.2001
MC19.11.2001
ES30.11.2001
[2008/17]
Former [2004/51]CY23.05.2001
FI23.05.2001
IE23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
GR24.08.2001
LU19.11.2001
MC19.11.2001
ES30.11.2001
Former [2004/39]CY23.05.2001
FI23.05.2001
IE23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
LU19.11.2001
MC19.11.2001
ES30.11.2001
Former [2004/05]CY23.05.2001
FI23.05.2001
IE23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
MC19.11.2001
ES30.11.2001
Former [2003/46]FI23.05.2001
IE23.05.2001
DK23.08.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
MC19.11.2001
Former [2002/48]FI23.05.2001
IE23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
MC19.11.2001
Former [2002/43]FI23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
MC19.11.2001
Former [2002/27]FI23.05.2001
PT23.08.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/15]FI23.05.2001
SE23.08.2001
Former [2002/05]SE23.08.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3528525  (GOLDWELL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 45 - line 53; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4823946  (STOEFFLER ALBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 36 - line 44; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US5759650  (RAINES CHARLES D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 5; figure 1 *