Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1005263

EP1005263 - Fastening device for an electronic apparatus or its supporting frame in a front plate opening [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.05.2012Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 06.06.2012  [2012/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VIPA Gesellschaft für Visualisierung und Prozessautomatisierung m.b.H.
Ohmstrasse 4
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
For all designated states
Seel, Wolfgang
Campestrasse 14
90419 Nürnberg / DE
[2005/19]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
VIPA Gesellschaft für Visualisierung und Prozessautomatisierung m.b.H.
Ohmstrasse 4
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
For all designated states
Seel, Wolfgang
Kärntner Strasse 1
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Seel, Wolfgang
Campestrasse 14
90419 Nürnberg / DE
 [2005/18]
Former [2000/22]01 / Seel, Wolfgang
Kärntner Strasse 1
91074 Herzogenaurach / DE
Representative(s)Dreykorn-Lindner, Werner
Patentanwalt
Steinlachstrasse 2
90571 Schwaig / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Dreykorn-Lindner, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Steinlachstrasse 2
90571 Schwaig / DE
Application number, filing date99123094.722.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateDE199815391823.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19853918
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1005263
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1005263
Date:27.12.2000
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1005263
Date:11.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H05K5/02, H02B1/04
[2000/52]
Former International [2000/22]H05K5/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Befestigungsvorrichtung für ein elektronisches Gerät oder dessen Tragrahmen in einem Frontplatten-Ausschnitt[2000/22]
English:Fastening device for an electronic apparatus or its supporting frame in a front plate opening[2000/22]
French:Dispositif de fixation d'un appareil électronique, ou son cadre-support dans l'ouverture d'une façade[2000/22]
Examination procedure25.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
25.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2005Fee for grant paid
14.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
17.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
CY22.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
[2012/23]
Former [2007/34]FI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
CY22.11.2005
IT22.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2007/21]FI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
CY22.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2007/18]FI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/30]FI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
Former [2006/22]FI11.05.2005
NL11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2006/14]FI11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
GR11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
PT19.10.2005
Former [2006/13]FI11.05.2005
DK11.08.2005
SE11.08.2005
Former [2005/52]FI11.05.2005
SE11.08.2005
Former [2005/50]SE11.08.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2602288  (ENERTEC [FR]) [X] 1,2,9 * page 8 - page 10; figures 1-3B * * page 11, line 14 - page 13, line 3 *;
 [X]DE2905317  (METRAWATT GMBH) [X] 1,2,4 * page 7, line 10 - page 7, line 16 * * page 7, line 24 - page 8, line 3 * * page 8, line 13 - page 8, line 35; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]EP0154782  (OLTEN AG ELEKTRO APPARATEBAU [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 3 - page 5; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE3710736  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [DE]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 25 - column 5, line 49; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE2619340  (IDEC IZUMI CORP) [A] 1 * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 9; figures 1-9 *;
 [DA]DE29519019U  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [DA]DE4231827  (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]);
 [DA]DE29717609U  (BERNSTEIN HANS SPEZIALFABRIK [DE]);
 [DA]DE1897975U  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]);
 [DA]DE1700201U  (KLOECKNER MOELLER ELEKTRIZIT [DE]);
 [DA]DE7624442U  (CAMLOC FASTENER GMBH);
 [DA]DE3621262  (KITAGAWA IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [DA]DE3615552  (KITAGAWA IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [DA]DE3609424  (KITAGAWA IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [DA]DE3605143  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [DA]DE3600471  (KITAGAWA IND CO LTD [JP])