Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1063279

EP1063279 - Refrigerator oil for carbon dioxide refrigerant, and method of using it for lubrication [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.05.2015
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): BE
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IDEMITSU KOSAN CO., LTD.
1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[2014/27]
Former [2000/52]For all designated states
Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd.
1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tazaki, Toshinori
24-4, Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0107 / JP
[2000/52]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2000/52]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99123107.718.11.1999
[2000/52]
Priority number, dateJP1999017462921.06.1999         Original published format: JP 17462999
JP1999018119028.06.1999         Original published format: JP 18119099
[2000/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1063279
Date:27.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1063279
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:C10M171/00, C10M107/34, C10M107/32, C10M169/04, C09K5/04, // (C10M169/04, 107:32, 107:34, 129:40, 129:42, 137:04), C10N40:30
[2014/27]
Former International [2000/52]C10M171/00, C10M107/34, C10M107/32, C10M169/04, C09K5/04, // (C10M169/04, 107:32, 107:34, 129:40, 129:42, 137:04), C10N40:30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/52]
TitleGerman:Ölzusammensetzung für Kältemaschinen mit Kohlendioxyd als Kältemittel und Verfahren zu ihrer Verwendung als Schmiermittel[2014/11]
English:Refrigerator oil for carbon dioxide refrigerant, and method of using it for lubrication[2000/52]
French:Huile pour refrigerateur utilisant le dioxide de carbone comme refrigérant et procede de son utilisation comme lubrifiant[2014/04]
Former [2000/52]Ölzusammensetzung für Kältemaschinen mit Kohlendioxyd als Kältemittel und Verfahren zu ihrer Verwendung als Schmiermittel
Former [2000/52]Huile pour refrigerateur utilisant le dioxide de carbone comme refrigérant et procédé de son utilisation comme lubrifiant
Examination procedure22.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
21.07.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2013Date of oral proceedings
05.02.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2014Fee for grant paid
16.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP04016688.6  / EP1491616
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.01.2005
Opposition(s)07.04.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
21.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
23.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
26.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
26.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
27.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
26.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
14.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
IT02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
GR03.10.2014
PT03.11.2014
IE18.11.2014
LU18.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2015/46]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
IT02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
GR03.10.2014
PT03.11.2014
IE18.11.2014
LU18.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
IT02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
GR03.10.2014
PT03.11.2014
LU18.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
IT02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
GR03.10.2014
PT03.11.2014
LU18.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
IT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
GR03.10.2014
PT03.11.2014
LU18.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
IT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
GR03.10.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
GR03.10.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY02.07.2014
ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
GR03.10.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/10]ES02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
Former [2015/09]FI02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH1046169  ;
 [A]EP0739973  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [A] 2-4,7 * page 2, lines 19-34; examples 1-18; tables 1,2 *;
 [E]EP1008643  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [E] 1,4,6-9,17,18 * examples 1-22; claims 1-4; tables 1-6 *;
 [X]WO9850499  (RWE DEA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,9 * page 5, lines 5-9 * * page 6, lines 31-35; figure 1 *;
 [X]DE19842019  (DENSO CORP KARIYA CITY AICHI P [JP]) [X] 1,4,17,18 * column 3, line 13 - column 5, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]DE19719132  (RWE DEA AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-9 * examples 2-8; table 1 *;
 [E]EP0992572  (NIPPON MITSUBISHI OIL CORP [JP]) [E] 1,4-9 * claims 1-6; tables 1,2 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, [X] 1,4,5,7,17,18 * abstract *