Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004716

EP1004716 - Insulation panel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  14.08.2015
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.09.2015  [2015/38]
14.08.2015Revocation of patentpublished on 16.09.2015  [2015/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JOMA Dämmstoffwerk GmbH
Jomaplatz 1
D-87752 Holzgünz/Allgäu / DE
For all designated states
Weber & Broutin Deutschland GmbH
Am Steinwerk 17
57413 Finnentrop-Heggen / DE
[2007/37]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
JOMA-Dämmstoffwerk GmbH
Jomaplatz 1
D-87752 Holzgünz/Allgäu / DE
For all designated states
Weber & Broutin Deutschland GmbH
Am Steinwerk 17
57413 Finnentrop-Heggen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mang Jr., Josef
Hermann-Löns-Weg 5
87740 Buxheim / DE
02 / Mang, Roland
Dresdner Strasse 3
87700 Memmingen / DE
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Fiener, Josef
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col.
P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/27]Fiener, Josef
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
Former [2000/22]Fiener, Josef
Postfach 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
Application number, filing date99123153.122.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateDE1998220909U23.11.1998         Original published format: DE 29820909 U
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004716
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004716
Date:16.08.2001
[2001/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004716
Date:12.09.2007
Language:DE
[2007/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:E04B1/80, E04B1/76
[2001/33]
Former International [2000/22]E04B1/80
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Dämmplatte[2000/22]
English:Insulation panel[2000/22]
French:Panneau d'isolation[2000/22]
Examination procedure18.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/18]
21.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
17.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2007Fee for grant paid
30.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.06.2008  18.06.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Steinbacher Dämmstoff GmbH
Salzburger Strasse 35
6383 Erpfendorf / AT
Opponent's representative
Torggler, Paul Norbert
Torggler & Hofinger
Patentanwälte
Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16
6020 Innsbruck / AT
 [N/P]
Former [2008/30]
Opponent(s)01  10.06.2008  18.06.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Steinbacher Dämmstoff GmbH
Salzburger Strasse 35
6383 Erpfendorf / AT
Opponent's representative
Torggler, Paul Norbert
Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16
6020 Innsbruck / AT
18.07.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.01.2009Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.02.2010Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2012Reply to a communication from the opposition division
20.02.2014Date of oral proceedings
20.02.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/38]
27.02.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.02.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.04.2010Appeal received No.  T0815/10
10.06.2010Statement of grounds filed
23.11.2011Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
23.11.2011Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2011Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:29.08.2006Request for further processing filed
25.08.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.09.2006Decision despatched
29.08.2005Request for further processing filed
25.08.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.09.2005Decision despatched
17.08.2004Request for further processing filed
13.08.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.09.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.09.2007
DK12.09.2007
FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
IE12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
LU22.11.2007
FR30.11.2007
IT30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE12.12.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
[2015/38]
Former [2015/33]CY12.09.2007
DK12.09.2007
FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
IE12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
LU22.11.2007
FR30.11.2007
IT30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE12.12.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
Former [2015/30]CY12.09.2007
DK12.09.2007
FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
IE12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
LU22.11.2007
FR30.11.2007
IT30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE12.12.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
Former [2014/38]CY12.09.2007
DK12.09.2007
FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
IE12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
LU22.11.2007
FR30.11.2007
IT30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE12.12.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
Former [2011/27]CY12.09.2007
DK12.09.2007
FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
IE12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
LU22.11.2007
FR30.11.2007
IT30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE12.12.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
Former [2010/06]CY12.09.2007
DK12.09.2007
FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
IE12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
LU22.11.2007
FR30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE12.12.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
Former [2009/30]DK12.09.2007
FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
IE12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
FR30.11.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE12.12.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
Former [2008/45]DK12.09.2007
FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
IE12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE12.12.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
Former [2008/35]DK12.09.2007
FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE12.12.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
Former [2008/29]FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
MC30.11.2007
SE12.12.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
Former [2008/28]FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
SE12.12.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
Former [2008/24]FI12.09.2007
GB12.09.2007
NL12.09.2007
GR13.12.2007
ES23.12.2007
PT12.02.2008
Former [2008/21]FI12.09.2007
GR13.12.2007
Former [2008/17]FI12.09.2007
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE19704715  (MAXIT BAUSTOFF UND KALKWERK MA [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 3,7,8,10;
 [XY]DE9407732U  (GEFINEX JACKON GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 1 - page 4, paragraph 3; figures 1,5 * [Y] 3,5-8;
 [Y]DE3610012  (GUENTHNER OTTO [DE]) [Y] 3 * abstract * * column 5, lines 6-8; figure 2 *;
 [Y]DE3743166  (SEITNER FRANZ JOSEF [DE], et al) [Y] 5 * figures 3,5; claims 1,2,4 *;
 [YD]DE3038490  (MAGERLE OTTO ING) [YD] 6,7,10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE7837566U  (HECK, FRIEDRICH) [Y] 8 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 10, paragraph 6; figures 1,2 *
by applicantDE9407732U
 DE7739252U
 DE3038490
 DE7621177U
 DE19704715