blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1004834

EP1004834 - Air conditioning systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujii, Toshiro
KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Yokomachi, Naoya
KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Okabe, Takanori
KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Koide, Tatsuya
KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99123172.123.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateJP1998033318624.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33318698
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004834
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004834
Date:23.01.2002
[2002/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.2001
ClassificationIPC:F25B49/02, F25B41/04, F04B27/18, B60H1/00
[2000/22]
CPC:
F25B6/04 (EP,US); B60H1/3223 (EP,US); F04B27/1804 (EP,US);
F25B41/20 (EP,US); F25B41/24 (EP,US); F04B2027/185 (EP,US);
F25B2400/0403 (EP,US); F25B2400/0411 (EP,US); F25B49/022 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2002/41]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Klimaanlagen[2000/22]
English:Air conditioning systems[2000/22]
French:Systèmes de conditionnement d'air[2000/22]
Examination procedure23.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/22]
24.07.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.11.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT
11.11.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) SE
24.07.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/49]
12.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.08.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH0821365  ;
 [XA]US5282329  (TERANISHI TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 2,3,6,9,11,13,16 * abstract * * figures 3A,3B * [A] 7,8,18;
 [X]JPH06200875  ;
 [PX]EP0894651  (DENSO CORP [JP]) [PX] 1,10,12 * paragraph [0088] * * figure 12 *;
 [A]US5291941  (ENOMOTO MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 2,11,13 * abstract * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US4723891  (TAKENAKA KENJI [JP], et al);
 [A]EP0980976  (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]);
 [A]JPH0443873  ;
 [A]JPH04321779
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08021365 A 19960123 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [X] 1,3-5,9,10,12,14,15,19 * abstract * * figure 4 * [A] 8
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941027), vol. 018, no. 563, Database accession no. (M - 1693), & JP06200875 A 19940719 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [X] 2,11,13 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920526), vol. 016, no. 226, Database accession no. (M - 1254), & JP04043873 A 19920213 (CALSONIC CORP) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930325), vol. 017, no. 151, Database accession no. (M - 1387), & JP04321779 A 19921111 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [A] * abstract *
by applicantDE19704914
    - LORENZ, BALES UND BROMANN, "Performance Comparison of Combitanks using a six-day test", PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE NORTH SUN, HELSINKI, (1997), pages 119 - 128
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.