Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1006269

EP1006269 - Control apparatus for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.01.2006  [2006/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/02]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Iida, Yutaka
c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP
[2000/23]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/23]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99123306.522.11.1999
[2000/23]
Priority number, dateJP1998033910930.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33910998
[2000/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1006269
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1006269
Date:31.10.2001
[2001/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1006269
Date:12.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:F02D9/06, F02D33/02, F02D41/12, F02D41/40
[2000/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/29]
Former [2000/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Steuervorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine[2000/23]
English:Control apparatus for internal combustion engine[2000/23]
French:Dispositif de commande pour moteur à combustion interne[2000/23]
Examination procedure23.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/23]
17.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2004Fee for grant paid
26.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0704610  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 10 - line 15 * * column 2, line 23 - line 30 *;
 [A]DE2625095  (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH09287457
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, [A] 1 * abstract *