Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1074745

EP1074745 - Hydraulic machine with automatic control device attached [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2006
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, LU
published on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leader Pumps Group S.p.A.
Via Bonanno Pisano, 1
56031 Bientina (Pi) / IT
[2004/30]
Former [2001/06]For all designated states
Eng & Mark s.r.l.
Via Campagna 72
56020 La Rotta-Pontedera (PI) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Cuccioli, Giorgio
Loc. Pontaccio, 5
56032 Buti (PI) / IT
 [2001/06]
Representative(s)Turini, Laura
Studio Legale Turini
Via Lamarmora 55
50121 Florence (FI) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/06]Turini, Laura
Studio Legale Avv. Laura Turini, Via Castello 50
56030 S. Pietro Belvedere (PI) / IT
Application number, filing date99123319.823.11.1999
[2001/06]
Priority number, dateIT1999PI0004706.08.1999         Original published format: IT PI990047
[2001/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1074745
Date:07.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1074745
Date:13.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP02.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:F04D15/02, F04D29/62, F04D29/66
[2001/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/06]
TitleGerman:Hydraulische Maschine versehen mit automatischer Steuereinrichtung[2001/06]
English:Hydraulic machine with automatic control device attached[2001/06]
French:Machine hydraulique munie d'un dispositif de commande automatique[2001/06]
Examination procedure12.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
23.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2005Fee for grant paid
19.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
08.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.07.2005
BE13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
DK13.10.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
CY23.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
PT19.12.2005
[2007/21]
Former [2006/30]AT13.07.2005
BE13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
DK13.10.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
PT19.12.2005
Former [2006/26]AT13.07.2005
BE13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
DK13.10.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
PT19.12.2005
Former [2006/25]AT13.07.2005
BE13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
PT19.12.2005
Former [2006/14]AT13.07.2005
CH13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
LI13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
GR13.10.2005
SE13.10.2005
PT19.12.2005
Former [2006/13]AT13.07.2005
FI13.07.2005
SE13.10.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9836339  (HYDROSERVICE S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1,3-14 * abstract * * page 4, lines 11-24 * * page 5, line 9 - page 9, line 16 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]US3897178  (PALLOCH HERBERT) [Y] 2 * column 1, line 56 - column 3, line 2 *;
 [A]US5354182  (NIEMIEC ALBIN J [US], et al) [A] 2 * column 3, lines 16-29 *;
 [A]US5135031  (BURGESS ROY T [US], et al) [A] 1,3-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 3-35 * * column 2, lines 29-34 - lines 41-45 * * column 3, lines 23-30 * * column 4, lines 25-28 *;
 [A]US5738495  (CARMIGNANI CLAUDIO [IT], et al) [A] 1,3-14 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9213195  (JEDRAY PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1,3-14 * abstract *