EP1004793 - Puzzle cut seamed belt having ultraviolet curable adhesive seam and methods thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thornton, Constance J. 6482 County Line Road Ontario, New York 14519 / US | 02 /
Schlueter, Edward L., Jr. 53 Glenside Way Rochester, New York 14612 / US | 03 /
Brothers, Thomas E. 188 Erath Drive Rochester, New York 14626 / US | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99123368.5 | 23.11.1999 | [2000/22] | Priority number, date | US19980199757 | 25.11.1998 Original published format: US 199757 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1004793 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1004793 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16G3/10, G03G15/00 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
B29C66/1142 (EP,US);
B29C65/1406 (EP,US);
B29C65/1454 (EP,US);
B29C65/1483 (EP,US);
B29C65/4845 (EP,US);
B29C65/524 (EP,US);
B29C65/54 (EP,US);
B29C65/56 (EP,US);
B29C65/72 (EP,US);
B29C66/12821 (EP,US);
B29C66/12842 (EP,US);
B29C66/2272 (EP,US);
B29C66/2274 (EP,US);
B29C66/2276 (EP,US);
B29C66/30321 (EP,US);
B29C66/30325 (EP,US);
B29C66/4322 (EP,US);
B29C66/4324 (EP,US);
B29C66/49 (EP,US);
B29C66/72321 (EP,US);
B29C66/7234 (EP,US);
B29C66/836 (EP,US);
B29C66/855 (EP,US);
F16G3/00 (EP,US);
F16G3/10 (EP,US);
G03G15/754 (EP,US);
G03G5/10 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122 (EP,US);
B29C66/81267 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2069/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/8122, B29K2883/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/07] |
Former [2000/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gurt mit formschlüssigem und UV-hartbarem Klebstoff aufweisender Verbindung und Verfahren dafür | [2000/22] | English: | Puzzle cut seamed belt having ultraviolet curable adhesive seam and methods thereof | [2000/22] | French: | Courroie à jonction à découpes imbriquées et à adhésif traitable par ultraviolets et procédés correspondants | [2000/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 30.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5487707 (SHARF LUCILLE M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 14; figures 1-10 *; | [PA]US5942301 (SCHLUETER JR EDWARD L [US], et al) [PA] 1 * column 12, line 36 - line 42; figures 1,10 *; | [A]US5761595 (TARNAWSKYJ IHOR W [US], et al) [A] 9 * column 5, line 10 - line 23 * |