Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1005824

EP1005824 - Dust bag [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.11.2006  [2006/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MELITTA HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft
Ringstrasse 99
D-32427 Minden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
MELITTA HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft
Ringstrasse 99
D-32427 Minden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Miller, Balthasar
Göhrdestrasse 21
29499 Zernien / DE
[2000/23]
Representative(s)Stracke, Alexander , et al
Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Jöllenbecker Strasse 164
33613 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date99123410.524.11.1999
[2000/23]
Priority number, dateDE1998221528U02.12.1998         Original published format: DE 29821528 U
[2000/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1005824
Date:07.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1005824
Date:12.12.2001
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47L9/14
[2000/23]
Designated contracting statesDE [2002/36]
Former [2000/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Filterbeutel[2000/23]
English:Dust bag[2000/23]
French:Sac à poussière[2000/23]
Examination procedure18.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/29]
01.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/47]
07.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200103   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2002
30.11.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XPA]EP0893151  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [XP] 1,3,7 * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 43; figures 1,3,4; claims 3,17 * [A] 4,7;
 [A]US5607735  (BROWN JAMES P [US]) [A] 3,8,10 * column 1, lines 49-64 * * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 42; figure 1; example 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE3129371  (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *