Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004762

EP1004762 - Method for controlling the injection and ignition in a direct-injection endothermic engine, in order to accelerate heating of the catalytic converter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.01.2005  [2005/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN S.p.A.
Viale Aldo Borletti, 61/63
20011 Corbetta (MI) / IT
[2004/06]
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN S.p.A.
Viale Aldo Borletti, 61/63
20011 Corbetta (Milano) / IT
Former [2003/45]For all designated states
MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN S.p.A.
Corso Ferrucci, 112/A
10138 Torino / IT
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
MAGNETI MARELLI S.p.A.
Via Griziotti 4
20145 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Poggio, Luca
Via Genova, 39
15047 Spinetta Marengo / IT
02 / Secco, Marco
Via Fabiani, 2
14049 Nizza Monferrato / IT
03 / Gelmetti, Andrea
Via Pasubio, 38
40134 Bologna / IT
[2000/35]
Former [2000/22]01 / Poggio, Luca
Via Genova, 39
15047 Spinetta Marengo / IT
02 / Secco, Marco
Via Fabiani, 2
14049 Nizza Monferrato / IT
03 / Gelmetti, Andrea
Via Zanardi, 275
40131 Bologna / IT
Representative(s)Cerbaro, Elena , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Cerbaro, Elena, Dr. , et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date99123510.225.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateIT1998BO0066126.11.1998         Original published format: IT BO980661
[2000/22]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1004762
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004762
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02D41/02, F02D41/40
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/07]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung der Einspritzung und der Zündung in einer Brennkraftmaschine zum aufheizen eines Abgaskatalysators[2000/22]
English:Method for controlling the injection and ignition in a direct-injection endothermic engine, in order to accelerate heating of the catalytic converter[2000/22]
French:Méthode de controle de l'injection et de l'allumage d'un moteur à explosion pour accélérer le chauffage du pot catalytique[2000/22]
Examination procedure16.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
12.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2003Fee for grant paid
30.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0831226  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,4,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 3, line 13 * * column 10, line 33 - column 11, line 27 * * claims 1-6 * * figure - *;
 [Y]EP0856655  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1,4,9 * abstract * * column 9, line 38 - column 12, line 11 * * claims 1-18 * * figures 3-6 *;
 [A]WO9844245  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1;
 []EP0903481  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0017] , [0146] - [0150] *;
 [A]GB2301459  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure - * * claim - *;
 [A]FR2721653  (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE SA [FR]) [A] 3 * abstract * * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0826869  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 5,6 * abstract * * page 1, line 25 - page 7, line 16 * * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 49 * * figures 4,5 *
ExaminationWO9603571