Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1005802

EP1005802 - Shoe stretcher [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.04.2003  [2003/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CIAC S.p.A.
Viale Ortles, 11-13
20139 Milano / IT
[2000/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Crespi, Roberta
Via Mazzini, 35/A
20020 Busto Garolfo (MI) / IT
02 / Vignati, Romano
Via Mazzini, 35/A
20020 Busto Garolfo(Mi) / IT
[2000/23]
Representative(s)Savi, Alberto , et al
c/o CON LOR SPA, Via Renato Fucini, 5
20133 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]Savi, Alberto , et al
c/o CON LOR SPA, Via Renato Fucini, 5
20133 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99123613.426.11.1999
[2000/23]
Priority number, dateIT1998MI0078302.12.1998         Original published format: IT MI980783
[2000/23]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1005802
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1005802
Date:23.01.2002
[2002/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:A43D3/14
[2000/23]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/41]
Former [2000/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schuhspanner[2000/23]
English:Shoe stretcher[2000/23]
French:Embauchoir[2000/23]
Examination procedure24.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/16]
14.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.08.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.08.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
29.08.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]FR678019  (ARGENCE;ARGENCE ALFRED-VICTORIEN) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 46 - line 58; figure - *;
 [X]US1488115  (HANSEN JOHN S) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [X]GB249528  (ALFRED VICTORIN ARGENCE) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 2; figures 1,2 *