Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1097690

EP1097690 - Patient or nursing bed [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.07.2003  [2003/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eickhoff, Claus
Am Kattenstein 2
59602 Rüthen / DE
For all designated states
Weigelin, Hans Günther, Dr. med. univ.
Hochstrasse 5
59581 Warstein / DE
[2001/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Eickhoff, Klaus
Am Kattenstein 2
D-59602 Rüthen / DE
02 / Weigelin, Hans Günther Dr. med. univ.
Hochstrasse 5
D-59581 Warstein / DE
 [2001/19]
Representative(s)Basfeld, Rainer , et al
Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 1580
59705 Arnsberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Basfeld, Rainer, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ostentor 9
59757 Arnsberg-Herdringen / DE
Application number, filing date99123645.627.11.1999
[2001/19]
Priority number, dateDE199915282403.11.1999         Original published format: DE 19952824
[2001/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1097690
Date:09.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1097690
Date:16.01.2002
[2002/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61G7/008
[2001/19]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/40]
Former [2001/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kranken- oder Pflegebett[2001/19]
English:Patient or nursing bed[2001/19]
French:Lit pour malades ou de soins[2001/19]
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
20.10.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
17.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/27]
29.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.11.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.11.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
12.11.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5404603  (FUKAI KOUSHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,17 * column W * [Y] 13-16;
 [X]US4432353  (VRZALIK JOHN H [US]) [X] 1-5,7,10,11,17 * column W *;
 [Y]US5940911  (WANG YI-LUNG [TW]) [Y] 13,14 * column 3, line 47 - line 52; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US5216768  (BODINE OLIVER H [US], et al) [Y] 15,16 * column 6, line 35 - line 65; figures 2,4 *
by applicantDE19723927