Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1006414

EP1006414 - Electrophotographic photosensitive member, process cartridge, and electrophotographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Suzuki, Koichi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Kimura, Tomohiro
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Tanaka, Masato
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Nagasaka, Hideaki
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/23]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2001/14]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/23]Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date99123744.730.11.1999
[2000/23]
Priority number, dateJP1998034164901.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34164998
JP1998034165001.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34165098
[2000/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1006414
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1006414
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G03G5/10, G03G5/06, G03G5/14
[2000/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/08]
Former [2000/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrophotographisches lichtempfindliches Element, Prozesskartusche und elektrophotographischer Apparat[2000/23]
English:Electrophotographic photosensitive member, process cartridge, and electrophotographic apparatus[2000/23]
French:Elément photosensible, électrophotographique, unité de traitement et appareil électrophotographique[2000/23]
Examination procedure19.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
26.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2005Fee for grant paid
11.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0919877  (CANON KK [JP]) [PX] 1,4,16-22 * claims 1,13,14 * * page 3, line 44 - page 5, line 8 * * page 6; example 1 *;
 [X]US5358813  (IIJIMA MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,16,20,22 * column 4, line 15 - line 45 * * column 6, line 42 - line 60 * * column 11, line 29 * * column 18; example 22 *;
 [X]US5393629  (NUKADA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,7-10,16,20,22 * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 17 * * column 12, line 39 - line 53 * * column 13, line 20 - column 14, line 5 * * column 21; example 25 *;
 [X]US5800956  (MINEMURA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,11,12,16,20,22 * column 9, line 50 - column 11, line 10 * * column 16, line 50 - line 51 *;
 [A]US4357403  (SHIMADA FUMIO, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 40 - line 68 * * column 9, line 51 - line 55 *;
 [A]EP0841595  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,21,22 * page 4, line 51 - page 5, line 21 * * page 6 - page 8; example 1 *;
 [A]DE4412138  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *