Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1006395

EP1006395 - Liquid crystal display devices and processes for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.2015
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.04.2015  [2015/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
[2014/19]
Former [2000/23]For all designated states
DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 162-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shioda, Satoshi, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP
02 / Hojo, Mikiko, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP
03 / Ueda, Kenji, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP
04 / Sega, Shunsuke, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP
 [2014/19]
Former [2000/23]01 / Shioda, Satoshi, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP
02 / Hojo, Mikiko, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP
03 / Ueda, Kenji, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP
04 / Sega, Shunsuke, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Former [2000/23]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date99123954.206.12.1999
[2000/23]
Priority number, dateJP1998036185605.12.1998         Original published format: JP 36185698
[2000/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1006395
Date:07.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1006395
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1339
[2000/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/08]
Former [2000/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtungen sowie deren Herstellungsverfahren[2000/23]
English:Liquid crystal display devices and processes for producing the same[2000/23]
French:Dispositifs d'affichages à cristaux liquides et leurs procédés de fabrication[2000/23]
Examination procedure03.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
30.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
27.03.2014Fee for grant paid
27.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.12.2003
Opposition(s)10.02.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
21.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
18.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
22.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
29.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
28.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[A]US5781259  (SHINOMIYA TOKIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 43 * * column 6, line 39 - line 67; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0850984  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 8, line 13 - line 40 * * page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 30 * * page 13, line 28 - line 42; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5729312  (YAMAGISHI SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 7 * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 2 * * column 9, line 24 - column 10, line 47 * * column 19, line 40 - line 50 * * column 23, line 40 - line 52; figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US5751382  (YAMADA NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 45 - column 9, line 9 * * column 10, line 56 - column 11, line 67; figures 1,5 *;
 [A]JPH09160052  ;
 []US5956112  (FUJIMORI KOHICHI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 9, line 16 - column 10, line 34 * * column 13, line 26 - line 52; figures 1A-10 *;
 []JPH09160052  (SHARP KK) [ ] * figures 1,6-23 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, [A] 1-3,6-8 * abstract *
Examination   - CLINTON D J ET AL, Hardness testing of ceramic materials, MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, ELSEVIER SA, SWITZERLAND, TAIWAN, REPUBLIC OF CHINA, PAGE(S) 461 - 473, (19870801), ISSN 0254-0584, XP024148801

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0254-0584(87)90096-4