Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1076358

EP1076358 - Processing apparatus and method for cleaning this processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.12.2004  [2004/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON SALES CO., INC.
11-28, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0073 / JP
For all designated states
SEMICONDUCTOR PROCESS LABORATORY CO., LTD.
13-29, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]For all designated states
Canon Sales Co., Inc.
11-28, Mita 3-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0073 / JP
For all designated states
Semiconductor Process Laboratory Co., Ltd.
13-29, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Satoh, Noritada
Semiconduct. Process Lab. Co., Ltd., 13-29, Konan
2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / Ohira, Kouichi
Semiconduct. Process Lab. Co., Ltd., 13-29, Konan
2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / Matsui, Bunya
Semiconduct. Process Lab. Co., Ltd., 13-29, Konan
2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
04 / Maeda, Kazuo
Semiconduct. Process Lab. Co., Ltd., 13-29, Konan
2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2001/07]
Representative(s)Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Strasse 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/07]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date99124009.408.12.1999
[2001/07]
Priority number, dateJP1999022761811.08.1999         Original published format: JP 22761899
[2001/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1076358
Date:14.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1076358
Date:27.08.2003
[2003/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/00
[2001/07]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/21]
Former [2001/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Behandlungseinrichtung und Verfahren zur Reinigung dieser Behandlungseinrichtung[2001/07]
English:Processing apparatus and method for cleaning this processing apparatus[2001/07]
French:Appareil de traitement et méthode de nettoyage de cet appareil de traitement[2001/07]
Examination procedure27.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/49]
28.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
06.04.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
06.04.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
06.04.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200204   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2003
31.12.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH0897185  ;
 [X]JPH0529285
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, [X] 1-9 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930614), vol. 017, no. 310, Database accession no. (E - 1380), [X] 1-9 * abstract *