Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1041647

EP1041647 - Photovoltaic module and power generation system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  05.02.2010
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.02.2010Opposition rejectedpublished on 10.03.2010  [2010/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mizukami, Seishiro
2-9-18-206, Nishisakaidani-cho
Oharano Nishikyo-ku, Kyoto / JP
02 / Yamagishi, Hideo
153-1, Tanabe-kitsunegawa, Kyotanabe
Kyoto / JP
03 / Kondoh, Yuzuru
6-17-303, Seidou-cho, Ashiya
Hyogo / JP
04 / Kondo, Masataka
2-8-15, Kitagoyo, Kita-ku
Kobe / JP
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/40]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99124055.709.12.1999
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateJP1999008837630.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8837699
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1041647
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1041647
Date:17.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/048, H01L31/05, H01L31/042
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/40]
TitleGerman:Photovoltaisches Modul und Energieerzeugungssystem[2000/40]
English:Photovoltaic module and power generation system[2000/40]
French:Module photovoltaique et systéme de production d'energie[2000/40]
Examination procedure16.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/02]
19.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2003Date of oral proceedings
13.05.2003Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2003Fee for grant paid
22.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.12.2004  05.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
SCHOTT Solar AG
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 4
63755 Alzenau / DE
Opponent's representative
LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler
Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
ALPHA-Haus
Garmischer Strasse 35
81373 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2009/51]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2004  05.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
SCHOTT Solar AG
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 4
63755 Alzenau / DE
Opponent's representative
Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Karakatsanis
Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38
81669 München / DE
Former [2009/41]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2004  05.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
SCHOTT Solar GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 4
63755 Alzenau / DE
Opponent's representative
Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Karakatsanis
Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38
81669 München / DE
Former [2007/07]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2004  05.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
SCHOTT Solar GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 4
63755 Alzenau / DE
Opponent's representative
Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber
Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38
81669 München / DE
Former [2006/36]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2004  05.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
RWE SCHOTT Solar GmbH
Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 4
63755 Alzenau / DE
Opponent's representative
Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Czybulka
Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38
81669 München / DE
Former [2005/08]
Opponent(s)01  16.12.2004  05.01.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Kaneka Corporation
Asahi Shinbun Bldg. 3-2-4, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku
OSAKA, 530-8288 / JP
Opponent's representative
Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Karakatsanis
Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38
81669 München / DE
21.01.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.07.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.09.2006Date of oral proceedings
18.09.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.10.2006Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
10.11.2009Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/10]
Appeal following opposition30.11.2006Appeal received No.  T1829/06
26.02.2007Statement of grounds filed
10.11.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
10.11.2009Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
CY17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
FR17.03.2004
IT17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
PT17.08.2004
IE09.12.2004
LU09.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
CY17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
FR17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
IE09.12.2004
LU09.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2006/14]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
FR17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
IE09.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2006/13]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
NL17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
IE09.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
FR04.03.2005
Former [2005/46]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
MC31.12.2004
FR04.03.2005
Former [2005/45]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
DK17.06.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
Former [2005/02]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
ES28.06.2004
Former [2005/01]AT17.03.2004
BE17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/44]AT17.03.2004
CH17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
LI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT17.03.2004
FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI17.03.2004
GR17.06.2004
SE17.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI17.03.2004
SE17.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE2942328  (STONE PLATT CRAWLEY LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figure 2 * [Y] 3,6;
 [XY]EP0535614  (SHARP KK) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 6;
 [DY]JPH09326497  ;
 [A]US4609770  (NISHIURA MASAHARU ET AL) [A] * figures 3,10 *;
 [A]EP0855750  (CANON KK) [A] * figures 2A-2C *
 [DY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09326497 A 19971216 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [DY] 3 * abstract *