Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1041647 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1041647



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 621
02.02.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
10.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.12.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.12.2009 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 18
18.11.2009 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 36
05.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
04.11.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
03.11.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.2009 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 4
28.10.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.10.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
09.10.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 7
08.10.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.10.2009 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
06.10.2009 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
02.10.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.10.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.09.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.09.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Opposition 1
01.07.2009 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.06.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.06.2009 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.05.2009 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 8
26.05.2009 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.01.2009 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
22.08.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.07.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
24.07.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.07.2008 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.09.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.09.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
08.08.2007 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
19.07.2007 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
11.07.2007 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
01.03.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.02.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
28.02.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.02.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
26.02.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
26.02.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
26.02.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
22.02.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
13.12.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
05.12.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.11.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.10.2006 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
27.10.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 9
27.10.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.09.2006 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
18.09.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
18.09.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
18.09.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.09.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
18.09.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.09.2006 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.08.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
12.08.2006 Non-scannable object Opposition 3
08.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2006 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
03.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.08.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2006 Note on telephone consultation Opposition 1
01.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 10
27.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
27.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.07.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
25.07.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
19.07.2006 Note on telephone consultation Opposition 1
18.07.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.04.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
27.04.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.04.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.04.2006 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.03.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.03.2006 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
29.03.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.03.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.03.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.03.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.03.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.03.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
16.03.2006 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
16.03.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.07.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
03.06.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
25.05.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.01.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
21.01.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.01.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
16.12.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 10
16.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.12.2004 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
16.12.2004 Non-scannable object Opposition 4
16.12.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.12.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.12.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 38
05.02.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.10.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
22.10.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
22.10.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.06.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.06.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.06.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
13.05.2003 Annex to a communication Search / examination 9
13.05.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.05.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
13.05.2003 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
13.05.2003 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
14.03.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
14.03.2003 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
09.10.2002 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.10.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
07.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
07.10.2002 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
07.10.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.09.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
03.09.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
03.09.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.07.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.06.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.02.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
19.02.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.08.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.04.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
06.04.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.04.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
03.04.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
03.04.2000 Translation of priority document Search / examination 50
09.12.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
09.12.1999 Description Search / examination 22
09.12.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.12.1999 Drawings Search / examination 13
09.12.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6