Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1010510

EP1010510 - Metallic mold for tire curing, and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.09.2006  [2006/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.
36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105 / JP
[2005/41]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.
36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sano, Takuzou, The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd.
Hiratsu Factory, 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99124062.310.12.1999
[2000/25]
Priority number, dateJP1998035154710.12.1998         Original published format: JP 35154798
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1010510
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1010510
Date:14.01.2004
[2004/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1010510
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:B22D19/00
[2004/03]
Former International [2000/25]B29C33/38, B29C33/42, // B29L30:00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2004/41]
Former [2000/25]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Metallisches Formwerkzeug zur Reifenvulkanisierung und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[2005/23]
English:Metallic mold for tire curing, and process for producing the same[2000/25]
French:Moule en métal pour la vulcanisation de pneus et son procédé de fabrication[2000/25]
Former [2000/25]Metallisches Formwerkzeug zum Reifenvulkanisierung und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung
Examination procedure19.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/21]
14.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2005Fee for grant paid
27.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2026376  (HERBERT MASCHBAU KG) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JPH02255267  ;
 [Y]US5368799  (GALLI GIUSEPPE [IT], et al) [Y] 1,6,9,10 * column 13, line 46 - column 15, line 50; figure - *;
 [D]JPH04223108  ;
 [A]EP0818290  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [D]JPH1024423
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910107), vol. 015, no. 002, Database accession no. (M - 1065), [Y] 1,6,9,10 * abstract *
 [D]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, [D] * abstract *
 [D]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 5, [D] * abstract *