EP1010846 - Crash detent in a vehicle door lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2000/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markl, Rudolf Justinus-Kerner-Strasse 5 80686 München / DE | [2000/25] | Application number, filing date | 99124198.5 | 03.12.1999 | [2000/25] | Priority number, date | DE1998158414 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19858414 | [2000/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1010846 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1010846 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
E05B77/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/10] |
Former [2000/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Crashsperre an einem Türschloss eines Fahrzeugs | [2000/25] | English: | Crash detent in a vehicle door lock | [2000/25] | French: | Elément de blocage en cas de collision dans une serrure pour porte de vehicule automobile | [2000/25] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19738492 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US3799596 (NOZOMU T, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 50; figure - *; | [X]DE29622837U (KIEKERT AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5 * page 6, line 16 - page 8, line 28; figure - *; | [DA]DE19625392 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [DA] 1,4 * figure - *; | [A]US3583741 (BREITSCHWERDT WERNER, et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3719248 (BREITSCHWERDT W, et al) [A] 1 * figure - * |